RI S2353 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all campaign schedules of contributions submitted to the board of elections expressly indicate whether the contributor is a registered lobbyist.
Title
Campaign Contributions - Expenditures Reports
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] |
Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] | Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2353.pdf |