RI S2351 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - Meeting postponed (06/16/2016)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - Meeting postponed (06/16/2016)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes 10 yr solar incentive program run by energy resources & funds by $100,000 annual allocation from development fund for installing new solar energy system of 10 kw or less at owner's residence on/after 7/1/16 resulting in $500 payment.
Title
Renewable Energy Standard
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. James Doyle [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. John Pagliarini [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2016) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2351.pdf |