RI S2350 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the number of signatures that a candidate may submit for certification, to seventy-five (75) if fifty (50) signatures are required and to one hundred twenty-five (125) when one hundred (100) signatures are required.
Title
Nomination Of Party And Independent Candidates - Maximum Number Of Submitted Nomination Signatures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2350.pdf |