RI S2350 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the advertising of unhealthy food and beverage products in schools that do not meet minimum federal and state governmental nutrition standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health And Safety Of Pupils

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateSigned by Governor
2018-05-30SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-30HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-05-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/30/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-05-03HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-02SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/02/2018)
2018-04-25SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-04-20SenateScheduled for consideration (04/25/2018)
2018-03-14SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-09SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2018)
2018-03-06SenateMeeting postponed (03/07/2018)
2018-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback