RI S2344 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend the provisions of the general laws relating to the written determination of procurement of construction manager at-risk services.
Title
Relating To Public Property And Works
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |