RI S2343 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the council on elementary and secondary education to waive certain provisions of the laws for public schools but would prohibit the waiver of other listed provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Department Of Elementary And Secondary Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-06-19SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-06-19SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-19SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-15SenateScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-06-14SenateSenate voted to recommit to Senate Education
2018-06-13SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-08SenateScheduled for consideration (06/13/2018)
2018-03-28SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback