RI S2343 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - Meeting postponed (05/12/2016)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-11 - Meeting postponed (05/12/2016)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows municipalities to award bids for contracts in an amount less than $500,000 to a business located within its municipality if it is current on all taxes, its bid is within 10% of the lowest bid and it is willing to match the lowest bid.
Title
Award Of Municipal Contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/12/2016) |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2343.pdf |