RI S2341 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Committee recommends passage in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes the requirement that a student with disabilities be a college student in order to be eligible to participate in the Mary Brennan fellowship fund program and also removes the requirement that the fellowship program take place in Providence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Governor's Commission On Disabilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee transferred to House Finance
2018-06-07HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-06-06SenateSenate read and passed
2018-05-31SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/06/2018)
2018-05-30SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-25SenateScheduled for consideration (05/30/2018)
2018-04-25SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-20SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018)
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback