RI S2335 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Streamlines the application and examination process as well as the educational and experience standards for applicants seeking registration as professional land surveyors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Surveyors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateSigned by Governor
2018-05-31SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-31HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-05-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/31/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-05-02HouseReferred to House Corporations
2018-05-01SenateSenate read and passed
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/01/2018)
2018-04-24SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-20SenateScheduled for consideration (04/24/2018)
2018-02-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018)
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Commerce

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback