RI S2326 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the film office director to waive the primary locations within the state requirement for any feature film or television production spending a minimum of ten million dollars ($10,000,000) in qualified expenditures.
Title
Motion Picture Production Tax Credits
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-12 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/12/2020) |
2020-03-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2020-03-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/10/2020) |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/03/2020) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2020) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |