RI S2326 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the city of Newport to increase the cruise ship fees by one dollar ($1.00) per passenger for landing and one dollar ($1.00) per passenger for embarking.
Title
General Powers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to House Finance |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/08/2014) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2014) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |