RI S2325 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred to House Municipal Government
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts the town of New Shoreham from the jurisdiction of the division of public utilities and carriers for purposes of regulating transportation network companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Network Company Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseReferred to House Municipal Government
2018-04-10SenateSenate read and passed
2018-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/10/2018)
2018-04-03SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-30SenateScheduled for consideration (04/03/2018)
2018-03-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-16SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Commerce

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback