RI S2311 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special motor vehicle registration plates for the Rhode Island Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals (RISPCA).
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/12/2020) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2311.pdf |