RI S2299 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the use of tanning facilities by persons less than eighteen (18) years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tanning Facility Safety Standards Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-26HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-21SenateSenate passed Sub B in concurrence
2018-06-20SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed Sub B
2018-06-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub B
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-04-04HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-04-03SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/03/2018)
2018-03-27SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-03-23SenateScheduled for consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-03-08SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018)
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback