RI S2298 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes DOH to establish maximum contaminate levels of PFSA in drinking water and to set interim standards. Also requires DEM to set standards for PFSA in ground- and surface waters. Defines PFSA as hazardous substances.
Title
Pfas In Drinking Water, Groundwater And Surface Waters
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment & Agriculture: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment & Agriculture: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-21 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2022) |
2022-05-18 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/17/2022) |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/11/2022) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |