RI S2292 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Makes possession or use of a semi-automatic weapon rapid fire device to include bump stock, binary trigger or trigger crank punishable by up to ten (10) years imprisonment and/or a ten thousand dollars ($10,000) fine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weapons

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01SenateSigned by Governor
2018-05-31SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-31HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-05-29HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/31/2018)
2018-05-29HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-05-25HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2018-05-24SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/24/2018)
2018-05-17SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-11SenateScheduled for consideration (05/17/2018)
2018-03-06SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2018)
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback