RI S2288 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Referred to House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Referred to House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides students attending public schools enrolled in grades K-12 with a students' bill of rights prohibiting discrimination based on race, sex, gender, economic status or mental, physical, developmental or sensory disabilities.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
Sen. John Burke [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Referred to House Education |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2022) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |