RI S2288 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allow retired state employee nurses to return to state work for no more than 75 working days or150 half days with half pay, before their pension payments would be suspended
Title
Retirement System--contributions And Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2014) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Finance |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/09/2014) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Meeting postponed (02/26/2014) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |