RI S2278 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require that all children's jewelry sold rather than manufactured conform to the standards promulgated by the American society for testing and materials

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive Children's Jewelry Safety Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-27HouseSigned by Governor
2014-05-21HouseTransmitted to Governor
2014-05-21SenateHouse passed in concurrence
2014-05-15SenatePlaced on House Calendar (05/21/2014)
2014-05-14SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2014-05-09SenateScheduled for consideration (05/14/2014)
2014-05-08SenateReferred to House H.E.W.
2014-05-08SenateSenate read and passed
2014-04-30SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/08/2014)
2014-04-29SenateCommittee recommends passage
2014-04-21SenateScheduled for consideration (04/29/2014)
2014-02-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2014-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2014)
2014-02-04SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback