RI S2273 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Permits campaign funds to be used to pay all childcare expenses that are incurred as a direct result of campaign activity.
Title
Rhode Island Campaign Contributions And Expenditures Reporting
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Contribution and expendtures approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/25/2020) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2020) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |