RI S2271 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that fifty dollars ($50.00) of the filing fee paid to the HUD-approved agency for the mediation conference involving the mortgagee and mortgagor, shall be paid to the Rhode Island Legal Services.
Title
Mortgage Foreclosure And Sale
Sponsors
Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Meeting postponed (02/27/2020) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2271.pdf |