RI S2270 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the sunset provisions to the year 2023, in chapters 325 and 406 of the 2013 public laws in regard to 34-24-3.2, "mediation conference prior to mortgage foreclosure."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mortgage Foreclosure And Sale--mediation Conference

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-05-25HouseReferred to House Finance
2018-05-23SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/23/2018)
2018-05-15SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-11SenateScheduled for consideration (05/15/2018)
2018-03-20SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-16SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2018)
2018-02-28SenateMeeting postponed (03/01/2018)
2018-02-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback