RI S2266 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises juror's fees for each day's attendance on the superior court from $15.00 per day to $25.00 per day commencing July 1, 2020, and increases to $35.00 per day commencing July 1, 2021 and thereafter.
Title
Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/25/2020) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2020) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |