RI S2264 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds one new income tax bracket for purposes of state income taxation.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/10/2022) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2264.pdf |