RI S2264 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Set measurement standards for the sale of propane.
Title
Propane Gas Sales
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] | Sen. James Doyle [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] |
Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Propane gas sales approval of amendment lc 003123/2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-16 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/13/2014) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2014) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |