RI S2259 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designates the Class A Tall Ship commonly known as the "SSV Oliver Hazard Perry" as the official flagship and tall ship ambassador of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Emblems

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-04-26HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-04-25SenateSenate read and passed
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/25/2018)
2018-04-11SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-06SenateScheduled for consideration (04/11/2018)
2018-02-07SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2018)
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback