RI S2257 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes it easier for military service members and their spouses to obtain certifications and licenses issued by the department of labor and training.
Title
Department Of Labor And Training
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2018) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2257.pdf |