RI S2254 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates an additional surcharge of $10 for subsequent registration renewals for holders of the Plum Beach Lighthouse license plate, with the funds distributed to Friends of Plum Beach Lighthouse Inc. for the protection and upkeep of Plum Beach Lighthouse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Registration Of Motor Vehicles -- Special Plate For Friends Of Plum Beach Lighthouse, Inc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-21HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-05-10HouseReferred to House Finance
2018-05-09SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/09/2018)
2018-05-02SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-04-27SenateScheduled for consideration (05/02/2018)
2018-02-14SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-09SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2018)
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback