RI S2244 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Gradually increases the hourly minimum wage from $9.60 to $15.00 on January 1, 2022, as well as gradually increasing the hourly minimum wage for employees receiving gratuities from $3.89 an hour to $15.00 an hour on January 1, 2026.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-07SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2018)
2018-03-06SenateMeeting postponed (03/07/2018)
2018-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Labor

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback