RI S2242 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals and replaces Richmond-Carolina Fire District charter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Richmond-carolina Fire District

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-06-19HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-04-06HouseReferred to House Municipal Government
2018-04-05SenateSenate read and passed
2018-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/05/2018)
2018-03-28SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-20SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-03-20SenateMeeting postponed (03/21/2018)
2018-03-16SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback