RI S2241 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the division of motor vehicles to create a special registration plate for private colleges and universities within the state.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] |
Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016) |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/29/2016) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2016) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |