RI S2238 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain executive, administrative, and professional employees from overtime pay if their weekly wages exceed one thousand thirty-six dollars ($1,036), an increase from the current two hundred dollars ($200).
Title
Minimum Wages--overtime Wages
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Cynthia Mendes [D] | Sen. Tiara Mack [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] |
Sen. Samuel Zurier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/04/2022) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2238.pdf |