RI S2238 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires all hospitals and freestanding ambulatory surgical facilities to adopt policies to use a smoke evacuation system for surgical procedures that generate surgical smoke.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing Of Health Care Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateSigned by Governor
2018-05-30SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-30HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2018-05-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/30/2018)
2018-05-23HouseCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-04-04HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-04-03SenateSenate read and passed
2018-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/03/2018)
2018-03-27SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-23SenateScheduled for consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-03-01SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2018)
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback