RI S2236 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the office of diversity, equity and opportunity (ODEO) to create, and for all state and municipal employees to receive, annual training in cultural competency. Defines "cultural competency".
Title
Department Of Administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor: Passage (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor: Passage (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-15 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-06-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2022) |
2022-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-03 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2022) |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred to House State Government & Elections |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/15/2022) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2022) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |