RI S2235 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a dispute resolution process for emergency services and surprise bills for medical services performed by nonparticipating (out-of-network) health care providers.
Title
Surprise Bills For Medical Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2018) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2235.pdf |