RI S2231 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Further defines the duties of the department of elderly affairs with regard to elder caregiver respite services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elderly Affairs Department

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-04-04HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-04-03SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (04/03/2018)
2018-03-27SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-03-23SenateScheduled for consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-02-06SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-02SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2018)
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback