RI S2226 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require that food or food products produced or made in RI only, derived from or containing genetically modified organisms be labeled as such by the manufacturer, retailer, or other person before putting it on the market for sale in RI

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Genetically Modified Organisms To Be Labeled

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-27SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2014-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2014)
2014-01-30SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback