RI S2225 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that the department of behavioral healthcare, developmental disabilities and hospitals with the power and duty to certify a list of chemical dependency professionals for use by state agencies and for referral of individuals for treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Powers And Duties -- Chemical Dependency Professionals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Chemical dependency professional approval of amendment (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed as amended in concurrence
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23HouseCommittee recommends passage as amended in concurrence
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/23/2018)
2018-05-11HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-05-10SenateSenate passed as amended (floor amendment)
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/10/2018)
2018-05-01SenateCommittee recommends passage
2018-04-27SenateScheduled for consideration (05/01/2018)
2018-04-10SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-06SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018)
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback