RI S2220 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions -- Confidentiality Of Health Care Communications And Information Act -- Health Care Communications And Information (would Require The Health Care Provider Of A Child Who Has Been Sexually Abused To Report The Abuse To The Appropriate Law Enforcement Entity)
Title
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions -- Confidentiality Of Health Care Communications And Information Act -- Health Care Communications And Information (would Require The Health Care Provider Of A Child Who Has Been Sexually Abused To Report The Abuse To The Appropriate Law Enforcement Entity)
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Rhoda Perry [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-11 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-10 | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-06-09 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2010-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to House H.E.W. | |
2010-05-26 | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2010-05-26 | Senate voted to reconsider | |
2010-05-26 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2010-05-20 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-18 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-18 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-02-25 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2220.pdf |