RI S2210 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Impose a 2% tax increase for all personal income over $250,000. The revenue raised by this tax increase would be used to fund the Head Start program
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee heard |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2014) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2210.pdf |