RI S2209 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the installation of designated electric vehicle parking spaces, with charging capabilities by certain businesses, municipalities, and housing developments in existing, new, or expanded parking lots commencing January 1, 2023.
Title
Parking Facilities And Privileges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2022) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2209.pdf |