RI S2203 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires coverage for the treatment of pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections/pediatric acute onset neuropsychiatric syndrome, including, but not limited to, the use of intravenous immunoglobin therapy.
Title
Relating To Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B as amended in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-23 | House | House passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment) |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2022-06-19 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-05-20 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/19/2022) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2022) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2022) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |