RI S2186 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes school committees to appoint one designee to the board of directors of the governing body of certain charter public schools which students from the district attend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishment Of Charter Public Schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2018-06-06SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-05-31SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/06/2018)
2018-05-30SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-05-25SenateScheduled for consideration (05/30/2018)
2018-05-23SenateCommittee continued
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-03-28SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback