RI S2185 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the minimum corporate tax from four hundred dollars ($400) to two hundred fifty dollars ($250) for the year beginning on January 1, 2022, and abolishes the minimum tax for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2023.
Title
Business Corporation Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] | Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] |
Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Finance: Be held for further study (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2022) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |