RI S2181 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that any person operating or owning a dam with a storage capacity greater than one thousand four hundred (1,400) normal storage acre feet of water to obtain a permit from the director of the DEM to raise or lower the water level behind the dam.
Title
Dam Permits
Sponsors
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Kendra Anderson [D] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-21 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2022) |
2022-06-10 | House | Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/09/2022) |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2022) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2022) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |