RI S2166 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the provisions of the general laws allowing deferred deposit providers, also known as "payday lenders."
Title
Licensed Activities -- Lenders And Loan Brokers -- Check Cashing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2022) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |