RI S2148 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amend the provisions of the general laws relating to state car tax in order that the assessment of used motor vehicles would be based on the average trade-in price, rather than retail price & would also extend the appeal period from 30 to 45 days
Title
Motor Vehicle And Trailer Excise Tax Elimination Act Of 1998
Sponsors
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub B |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2014-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-19 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2014) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |