RI S2143 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gradually increases the hourly minimum wage from $10.50 to $15 by July 1, 2024, and the hourly minimum wage for employees receiving gratuities from $3.89 an hour to $15 an hour by January 1, 2028.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2020) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Meeting postponed (01/29/2020) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2143.pdf |