RI S2128 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a pilot program to prevent drug overdoses through the establishment of harm reduction centers, and requires the director of the department of health to promulgate rules and regulations.
Title
Harm Reduction Center Advisory Committee And Pilot Program
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/30/2020) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |