RI S2122 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enhances reimbursement rates paid by the departments of human services and children, youth and families for children in the child care assistance program, starting with infants and toddlers.
Title
Child Care - State Subsidies
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee postponed at request of sponsor |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2018) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/13/2018) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2122.pdf |